VA HB5087 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment compensation; short-time compensation; sunset repeal; emergency. Repeals two sunset provisions from legislation enacted during the 2020 Regular Session of the General Assembly that, among other things, established a short-time compensation program that provides employers with the option of reducing the hours worked by employees while permitting the employees whose hours are reduced to receive partial compensation for lost wages. The bill also extends the date by which the Virginia Employment Commission is required to establish and implement such short-time compensation program from January 1, 2021, to January 1, 2022. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Unemployment compensation; extends date VEC is required to establish, etc., short-time compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (27-Y 10-N) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (79-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (27-Y 10-N) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (79-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008) | |
2020-10-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 8 (effective 10/21/20) | |
2020-10-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020 | |
2020-10-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020 |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5087ER) |
2020-10-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Committee amendment reconsidered (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (27-Y 10-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-09-08 | House | VOTE: Passage Emergency (79-Y 19-N) |
2020-09-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (79-Y 19-N) |
2020-09-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-09-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-02 | House | Read first time |
2020-08-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-08-26 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-08-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 20200548D |