VA HB5072 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Law-enforcement misconduct. Authorizes the Attorney General to file a civil suit or inquire into or seek to conciliate, through the Division of Human Rights, any unlawful pattern and practice against the Commonwealth or a locality whenever the Attorney General has reasonable cause to believe that law-enforcement officers of any agency of the Commonwealth or any locality are engaging in a pattern or practice that deprives persons of rights, privileges, or immunities secured or protected by the laws of the United States and the Commonwealth. The bill also empowers the Attorney General to issue a civil investigative demand if the Attorney General has reasonable cause to believe that an unlawful pattern and practice violation has occurred. The bill authorizes the Attorney General to enter into a conciliation agreement with a locality to resolve an unlawful pattern and practice, and provides that such agreement may include a court-enforceable deprivation of certain local funds if the locality fails to abide by the agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement; Attorney Gen. authorized to file civil suit or inquire into any unlawful practice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 41-N) (Y: 53 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)
2020-10-21House1st day of the 4th month following the month of adjournment, sine die, of this special session)
2020-10-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 18 (Per Article IV, Section 13, this bill will be effective on the
2020-10-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020
2020-10-14HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020
2020-10-07SenateSigned by President
2020-10-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5072ER)
2020-10-07HouseEnrolled
2020-10-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (53-Y 41-N)
2020-10-02HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (53-Y 41-N)
2020-10-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-01SenatePassed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N)
2020-10-01SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-10-01SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-10-01SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary with amendment (8-Y 1-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-08HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N)
2020-09-08HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N)
2020-09-04HouseEngrossed by House
2020-09-04HouseSubstitute by Delegate LaRock withdrawn 20201131D-H1
2020-09-04HouseRead second time
2020-09-03HouseFloor substitute printed 20201131D-H1 (LaRock)
2020-09-03HousePassed by for the day
2020-09-02HouseRead first time
2020-08-31HouseReported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N)
2020-08-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-08-26HouseReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 8-N)
2020-08-18HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-08-18HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200410D

Same As/Similar To

SB5024 (Same As) 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0019)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22511.1(n/a)See Bill Text
22520(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5072&202+sum+HB5072
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5072+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5072H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5072ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+CHAP0018+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H08V0014+HB5072
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0009+HB5072
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0070+HB5072
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0075+HB5072
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0050+HB5072
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5072+HB5072
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0187HB5072+HB5072
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0119+HB5072

Bill Comments

feedback