VA HB507 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Failed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (10-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Failed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (10-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Release of balloon prohibited; civil penalty. Prohibits any person, with certain exceptions, from knowingly releasing or causing to be released any balloon outdoors and provides that any person convicted of a violation shall be liable for a civil penalty of not less than $250 or more than $2,500, to be paid into the Litter Control and Recycling Fund. A court may, as an alternative to imposing the penalty, require the performance of at least 10 hours of community service in litter abatement activities. Current law prohibits a person from releasing 50 or more balloons within an hour and sets the civil penalty at $5 per balloon, with the proceeds deposited into the Lifetime Hunting and Fishing Endowment Fund.
Title
Release of balloons prohibited; civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (10-Y 10-N) (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (10-Y 10-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2020-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102800D |