VA HB5069 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 14 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Law-enforcement officers; prohibition on the use of neck restraints. Prohibits a law-enforcement officer from using a neck restraint in the performance of his official duties and provides for disciplinary sanctions on an officer who uses a neck restraint. The bill provides an exception from the prohibition if a neck restraint is immediately necessary to protect the officer or another person. The bill defines "neck restraint" as the use of any body part or object to attempt to control or disable a person by applying pressure against the neck, including the trachea or carotid artery, with the purpose, intent, or effect of controlling or restricting the person's movement or restricting the person's blood flow or breathing, including chokeholds, carotid restraints, and lateral vascular neck restraints.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement officers; prohibition on the use of neck restraints, exception, penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (60-Y 36-N) (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
2020-10-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020
2020-10-14SenateSigned by President
2020-10-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5069ER)
2020-10-14HouseEnrolled
2020-10-07HouseVOTE: Adoption (60-Y 36-N)
2020-10-07HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20201185D-S1 (60-Y 36-N)
2020-10-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-02SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N)
2020-10-02SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-10-02SenatePassed Senate with substitute (22-Y 17-N)
2020-10-02SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-10-02SenatePassed Senate with substitute (20-Y 18-N)
2020-10-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5069S1
2020-10-02SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20201185D-S1
2020-10-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-10-02SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by for the day
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201185D-S1
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 4-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-04HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N)
2020-09-04HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N)
2020-09-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB5069H1
2020-09-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20201037D-H1
2020-09-03HouseRead second time
2020-09-02HouseRead first time
2020-08-31HouseReported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N)
2020-08-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-08-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201037D-H1
2020-08-26HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N)
2020-08-18HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-08-18HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200533D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18251.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5069&202+sum+HB5069
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5069+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5069H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5069S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5069ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H08V0022+HB5069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0008+HB5069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0057+HB5069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0066+HB5069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0053+HB5069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5069+HB5069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0213HB5069+HB5069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0221HB5069+HB5069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0222HB5069+HB5069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0223HB5069+HB5069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0224HB5069+HB5069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0179+HB5069

Bill Comments

feedback