VA HB5064 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 16 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5064ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord remedies; noncompliance with rental agreement; payment plan. Requires a landlord who owns more than four rental dwelling units, or more than a 10 percent interest in more than four rental dwelling units, before terminating a rental agreement due to nonpayment of rent, to serve upon such tenant a written notice informing the tenant of the total amount due and owed and offer the tenant a payment plan under which the tenant must pay the total amount due and owed in equal monthly installments over a period of the lesser of six months or the time remaining under the rental agreement. The bill also outlines the remedies a landlord has if a tenant fails to pay the total amount due and owed or enter into a payment arrangement within fourteen days of receiving notice or if the tenant enters into a payment arrangement but fails to pay within fourteen days of the due date any rent that becomes due under the payment plan or arrangement after such plan or arrangement becomes effective. The bill clarifies that a tenant is not precluded from participating in any other rent relief programs available to the tenant through a nonprofit organization or under the provisions of a federal, state, or local law, regulation, or action. The bill sunsets on July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Residential Landlord &Tenant Act; landlord remedies, noncompliance with rental agreement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (57-Y 40-N) (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (22-Y 14-N) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (19-Y 17-N) (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 41-N) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-16HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5064ER)
2020-10-16HouseEnrolled
2020-10-14SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N)
2020-10-14HouseVOTE: Agreed To (57-Y 40-N)
2020-10-14HouseConference report agreed to by House (57-Y 40-N)
2020-10-14 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenators: Ebbin, Bell, Boysko
2020-10-07SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-10-07HouseDelegates: Price, Bulova, Morefield
2020-10-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-10-07HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-10-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenate insisted on substitute (22-Y 14-N)
2020-10-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (0-Y 95-N)
2020-10-02HouseSenate substitute rejected by House (0-Y 95-N)
2020-10-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-01SenatePassed Senate with substitute (23-Y 16-N)
2020-10-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5064S1
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-09-25SenatePassed by for the day
2020-09-25SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25SenatePassed Senate with substitute (19-Y 17-N)
2020-09-25SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5064S1
2020-09-25SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20201219D-S1
2020-09-25SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-09-25SenateRead third time
2020-09-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2020-09-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201219D-S1
2020-09-18SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 3-N)
2020-09-02SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-09-02SenateRead first time
2020-08-28HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 41-N)
2020-08-28HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 41-N)
2020-08-27HousePrinted as engrossed 20200266D-E
2020-08-27HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB5064E
2020-08-27HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-08-27HouseRead second time
2020-08-26HouseRead first time
2020-08-24HouseReported from General Laws with amendments (13-Y 9-N)
2020-08-18HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-08-18HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200266D

Same As/Similar To

SB5088 (Same As) 2020-10-16 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5088ER)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511245(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5064&202+sum+HB5064
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5064+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5064E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5064S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5064ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H11V0004+HB5064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0032+HB5064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S12V0019+HB5064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0139HB5064+HB5064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0147HB5064+HB5064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0148HB5064+HB5064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0181HB5064+HB5064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0117+HB5064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0236HB5064+HB5064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0277HB5064+HB5064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0188+HB5064

Bill Comments

feedback