VA HB5051 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 14 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Decertification of law-enforcement officer. Directs the Department of Criminal Justice Services to adopt standards of conduct applicable to law-enforcement and jail officers and due process procedures for decertification based on serious misconduct in violation of those standards. The bill requires any sheriff, chief of police, or agency administrator to notify the Criminal Justice Services Board in writing within 48 hours of becoming aware that any certified law-enforcement or jail officer currently employed by his agency has been terminated for engaging in misconduct, as set forth in the bill. The bill authorizes the Board to initiate decertification proceedings against any current or former law-enforcement or jail officer who has engaged in such activities. The bill directs the Department to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement officers or jail officers; notice to Criminal Justice Services Board of misconduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (79-Y 16-N) (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendments (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
2020-10-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020
2020-10-14SenateSigned by President
2020-10-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5051ER)
2020-10-14HouseEnrolled
2020-10-07HouseVOTE: Adoption (79-Y 16-N)
2020-10-07HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20201183D-S1 (79-Y 16-N)
2020-10-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-02SenatePassed Senate with substitute (31-Y 7-N)
2020-10-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5051S1
2020-10-02SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20201183D-S1
2020-10-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-10-02SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by for the day
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201183D-S1
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 2-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-04HouseVOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N)
2020-09-04HouseRead third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N)
2020-09-03HousePrinted as engrossed 20200474D-E
2020-09-03HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB5051E
2020-09-03HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-09-03HouseRead second time
2020-09-02HouseRead first time
2020-08-31HouseReported from Appropriations (14-Y 8-N)
2020-08-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-08-25HouseReported from Public Safety with amendments (16-Y 6-N)
2020-08-17HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-08-17HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200474D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521707(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5051&202+sum+HB5051
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5051+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5051E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5051S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5051ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H15V0006+HB5051
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0007+HB5051
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0056+HB5051
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0067+HB5051
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0038+HB5051
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5051+HB5051
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0212HB5051+HB5051
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0178+HB5051

Bill Comments

feedback