VA HB5050 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 16 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5050ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Emergency Services and Disaster Law; powers and duties of Governor; purchase of personal protective equipment during a disaster caused by a communicable disease of public health threat. Grants the Governor authority during a disaster caused by a communicable disease of public health threat for which a state of emergency has been declared to establish a program through which the Governor may purchase personal protective equipment (PPE) for private, nongovernmental entities and distribute the PPE to such private, nongovernmental entities. The bill exempts the Governor's procurement of such PPE from the provisions of the Virginia Public Procurement Act, but requires the Governor to provide for competition where practicable and include a written statement regarding the basis for awarding any contract. The bill also requires the Department of Emergency Management to consult with and survey private, nongovernmental entities prior to implementing any such program in order to assess demand for participation in the program, as well as the quantity and types of personal protective equipment such entities would like to procure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Services and Disaster Law; powers and duties of Governor, purchase of PPE.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (67-Y 30-N) (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (35-Y 1-N) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 94-N) (Y: 0 N: 94 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 39-N) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-16HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5050ER)
2020-10-16HouseEnrolled
2020-10-14SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-10-14HouseVOTE: Agreed To (67-Y 30-N)
2020-10-14HouseConference report agreed to by House (67-Y 30-N)
2020-10-13 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenators: McPike, Ruff, Marsden
2020-10-07SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-10-07HouseDelegates: Helmer, Bulova, Knight
2020-10-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-10-07HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-10-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenate insisted on substitute (35-Y 1-N)
2020-10-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (0-Y 94-N)
2020-10-02HouseSenate substitute rejected by House (0-Y 94-N)
2020-10-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-01SenatePassed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N 1-A)
2020-10-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5050S1
2020-10-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to
2020-10-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-09-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201221D-S1
2020-09-18SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-04HouseVOTE: Passage (58-Y 39-N)
2020-09-04HouseRead third time and passed House (58-Y 39-N)
2020-09-03HousePrinted as engrossed 20200767D-E
2020-09-03HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB5050E
2020-09-03HouseCommittee amendments from Apropriations agreed to
2020-09-03HouseCommittee amendments from General Laws agreed to
2020-09-03HouseRead second time
2020-09-02HouseRead first time
2020-08-31HouseReported from Appropriations with amendments (19-Y 3-N)
2020-08-24HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-08-24HouseReported from General Laws with amendments (14-Y 7-N)
2020-08-17HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-08-17HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200767D

Same As/Similar To

SB5039 (Same As) 2020-10-14 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224343(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5050&202+sum+HB5050
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5050+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5050E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5050S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5050ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H11V0002+HB5050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0006+HB5050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0055+HB5050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S12V0024+HB5050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0033+HB5050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5050+HB5050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0163HB5050+HB5050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0113+HB5050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0234HB5050+HB5050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0275HB5050+HB5050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0187+HB5050

Bill Comments

feedback