VA HB5049 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 16 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5049ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Acquisition and use of military property by law-enforcement agencies. Provides that no state or local law-enforcement agency shall acquire or purchase (i) weaponized unmanned aerial vehicles; (ii) aircraft that are configured for combat or are combat-coded and have no established commercial flight application; (iii) grenades or similar explosives or grenade launchers from a surplus program operated by the federal government; (iv) armored multi-wheeled vehicles that are mine-resistant, ambush-protected, and configured for combat from a surplus program operated by the federal government; (v) bayonets; (vi) firearms of .50 caliber or higher; (vii) ammunition of .50 caliber or higher; or (viii) weaponized tracked armored vehicles. These provisions do not apply to the Virginia National Guard or Virginia Defense Force. The bill prohibits the use of such military property by a law-enforcement officer unless a waiver has been granted by the Criminal Justice Services Board. The bill prohibits the use of kinetic impact munitions unless their use is necessary to protect a law-enforcement officer or another person from bodily injury. "Kinetic impact munitions" includes impact rounds and baton rounds, such as rubber batons, bean bag rounds, foam baton rounds, and plastic, wax, wood, or rubber-coated projectiles. The bill directs the Department of Criminal Justice Services (the Department) to establish training standards for law enforcement on the use of kinetic impact munitions and tear gas. The bill directs the Department to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement agencies; acquisition and use of military property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 95 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (27-Y 9-N) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-16HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5049ER)
2020-10-16HouseEnrolled
2020-10-14SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2020-10-14SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-10-14HouseVOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 42-N)
2020-10-14HouseConference report agreed to by House (54-Y 42-N)
2020-10-13HouseConference substitute printed 20201364D-H2
2020-10-13 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenators: Surovell, Locke, Stuart
2020-10-07SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-10-07HouseDelegates: Herring, Helmer, Campbell, J.L.
2020-10-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-10-07HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-10-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenate insisted on amendment (27-Y 9-N)
2020-10-07HouseVOTE: Rejected (1-Y 95-N)
2020-10-07HouseSenate substitute rejected by House (1-Y 95-N)
2020-10-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-02SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N)
2020-10-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5049S1
2020-10-02SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20201182D-S1
2020-10-02SenateCommittee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N)
2020-10-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Locke withdrawn
2020-10-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-10-02SenateCommittee substitute rejected
2020-10-02SenateRead third time
2020-10-02SenateFloor substitute printed 20201300D-S2 (Locke)
2020-10-01SenatePassed by for the day
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201182D-S1
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 4-N)
2020-09-15SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-10HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 42-N)
2020-09-10HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 42-N)
2020-09-10HousePassed by until after Resolutions Regular Calendar
2020-09-09HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB5049H1
2020-09-09HousePending question ordered
2020-09-09HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20201002D-H1
2020-09-09HouseAmendment by Delegate Helmer withdrawn
2020-09-09HouseRead second time
2020-09-08HousePassed by for the day
2020-09-04HouseRead first time
2020-09-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201002D-H1
2020-09-03HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-08-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-08-25HouseReported from Public Safety (13-Y 8-N)
2020-08-17HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-08-17HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200730D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521123.1(n/a)See Bill Text
1521721.1(n/a)See Bill Text
1521722.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182312(n/a)See Bill Text
225515(n/a)See Bill Text
91101(n/a)See Bill Text
91102(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5049&202+sum+HB5049
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5049+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5049H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5049S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5049S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5049H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5049ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H15V0011+HB5049
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0017+HB5049
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0073+HB5049
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0064+HB5049
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0055+HB5049
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5049+HB5049
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0216HB5049+HB5049
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0217HB5049+HB5049
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0254HB5049+HB5049
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0177+HB5049
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0287HB5049+HB5049
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0186+HB5049

Bill Comments

feedback