VA HB5047 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Post-Disaster Anti-Price Gouging Act; manufacturers and distributors. Prohibits any manufacturer or distributor from selling necessary goods or services at an unconscionable price during a declared state of emergency. Under current law, the prohibition does not apply to a manufacturer or distributor unless it advertises its goods or services to consumers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Post-Disaster Anti-Price Gouging Act; manufacturers and distributors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-25SenatePassed by for the day
2020-09-25SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-09-25SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-09-25SenateRead third time
2020-09-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2020-09-16SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (13-Y 2-N)
2020-09-04SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-09-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-03HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N)
2020-09-03HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 44-N)
2020-08-28HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-08-27HouseRead first time
2020-08-26HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N)
2020-08-17HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-08-17HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200223D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591526(n/a)See Bill Text
591527(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback