VA HB5045 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Enrolled on October 14 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Carnal knowledge of a person detained or arrested by a law-enforcement officer or an inmate, parolee, probationer, arrestee, juvenile detainee, or pretrial defendant or posttrial offender; local or state law-enforcement officer; penalty. Adds law-enforcement officers to those persons who are guilty of a Class 6 felony if they are in a position of authority over and carnally know without force, threat, or intimidation a person detained or arrested by a law-enforcement officer or an inmate, parolee, probationer, juvenile detainee, or pretrial defendant or posttrial offender, including those in the custody of a private, local, or state law-enforcement agency. In addition, the bill adds a person in the custody of a law-enforcement officer to the list of those persons for whom it is unlawful for a person in such authority to commit the offense of carnal knowledge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inmate, parolee, probationer, detainee, or pretrial defendant, etc.; carnal knowledge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
2020-10-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020
2020-10-14SenateSigned by President
2020-10-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5045ER)
2020-10-14HouseEnrolled
2020-10-07HouseVOTE: Adoption (94-Y 2-N)
2020-10-07HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20201181D-S1 (94-Y 2-N)
2020-10-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-02SenatePassed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
2020-10-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5045S1
2020-10-02SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by for the day
2020-10-01SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-10-01SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2020-10-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5045S1
2020-10-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to
2020-10-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201181D-S1
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-04HouseVOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2020-09-04HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
2020-09-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB5045H1
2020-09-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20201022D-H1
2020-09-03HouseRead second time
2020-09-02HouseRead first time
2020-08-31HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2020-08-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-08-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201022D-H1
2020-08-26HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2020-08-17HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-08-17HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200286D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18264.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5045&202+sum+HB5045
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5045+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5045H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5045S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5045ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H08V0020+HB5045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0005+HB5045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0061+HB5045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0063+HB5045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0035+HB5045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5045+HB5045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0160HB5045+HB5045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0178HB5045+HB5045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0206HB5045+HB5045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0176+HB5045

Bill Comments

feedback