VA HB5043 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Mental health awareness response and community understanding services (Marcus) alert system. Provides that the Department of Criminal Justice Services (DCJS) and the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services (DBHDS) shall support the development and establishment of a mental health awareness response and community understanding services (Marcus) alert system throughout the Commonwealth. The bill provides that, by July 1, 2021, DBHDS shall establish five Marcus alert programs and community care teams, one located in each of the five agency regions. By July 1, 2023, DBHDS shall establish five additional Marcus alert system programs and community care teams in such regions. Additional systems and teams are to be established in subsequent years and by July 1, 2026, all community services board or behavioral health geographical areas shall have established a Marcus alert system that uses community care teams. A "community care team" is defined in the bill as a group of mental health service providers working with registered peer recovery specialists and law-enforcement officers as a team, with the mental health service providers leading such team, to help stabilize individuals in crisis situations. A "mental health awareness response and community understanding services (Marcus) alert system" or "Marcus alert system" is defined in the bill as a process in which a call for service or other communication to an emergency 911 system or that is communicated with any other equivalent reporting system is routed for the appropriate services, including calls for service being directed to a community care team. The bill directs DBHDS and DCJS to submit a detailed plan for the establishment of a Marcus alert system that uses community care teams in community service boards or behavioral health authority geographical areas throughout the Commonwealth to the Joint Commission on Health Care no later than June 1, 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health crises; DCJS to assist DBHDS, etc., with development of Marcus alert system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (59-Y 38-N) (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Motion to reconsider passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day motion rejected (18-Y 20-N 1-A) (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (24-Y 12-N) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 3-N) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 39-N) (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-16SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 12-N)
2020-10-14SenatePassed by for the day
2020-10-14SenateMotion to reconsider passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 1-N)
2020-10-14SenatePassed by for the day motion rejected (18-Y 20-N 1-A)
2020-10-14HouseVOTE: Agreed To (59-Y 38-N)
2020-10-14HouseConference report agreed to by House (59-Y 38-N)
2020-10-14HousePassed by temporarily
2020-10-14HouseConference substitute printed 20201343D-H3
2020-10-14 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenators: McPike, McClellan, Stuart
2020-10-07SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-10-07HouseDelegates: Bourne, Hope, Kilgore
2020-10-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-10-07HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-10-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenate insisted on substitute (24-Y 12-N)
2020-10-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (0-Y 95-N)
2020-10-02HouseSenate substitute rejected by House (0-Y 95-N)
2020-10-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-01SenatePassed Senate with substitute (24-Y 15-N)
2020-10-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5043S1
2020-10-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to
2020-10-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201198D-S1
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 3-N)
2020-09-15SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-10HouseVOTE: Passage (57-Y 39-N)
2020-09-10HouseRead third time and passed House (57-Y 39-N)
2020-09-10HousePassed by until after Resolutions Regular Calendar
2020-09-09HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB5043H2
2020-09-09HouseAppropriations Committee substitute agreed to 20201114D-H2
2020-09-09HousePublic Safety Committee substitute rejected 20201023D-H1
2020-09-09HouseRead second time
2020-09-08HouseRead first time
2020-09-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201114D-H2
2020-09-04HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2020-08-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-08-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201023D-H1
2020-08-25HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-08-17HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-08-17HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200715D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91102(n/a)See Bill Text
91193(n/a)See Bill Text
91196(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5043&202+sum+HB5043
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5043+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5043H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5043H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5043S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5043H3+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H15V0005+HB5043
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0020+HB5043
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0076+HB5043
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0072+HB5043
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0046+HB5043
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5043+HB5043
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0182HB5043+HB5043
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0111+HB5043
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0233HB5043+HB5043
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0273HB5043+HB5043
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0274HB5043+HB5043
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0192+HB5043

Bill Comments

feedback