VA HB5041 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nursing homes, certified nursing facilities, and hospices; visitation; public health emergency. Requires the Board of Health to amend regulations governing nursing homes, certified nursing facilities, and hospices to require that, during a public health emergency related to COVID-19, each nursing home, certified nursing facility, and hospice establish a protocol to allow each patient to receive visits, consistent with guidance from the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention and as directed by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and the Board of Health. The bill contains an emergency clause and requires the Department of Health to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the act to be effective within 280 days of its enactment.
Title
Nursing homes, certified nursing facilities, and hospice facilities; public health emergency, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Terry Austin [R] | Del. John Avoli [R] |
Del. Amanda Batten [R] | Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. Robert Bloxom [R] | Sen. Emily Brewer [R] |
Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Kirkland Cox [R] | Del. Carrie Coyner [R] |
Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. James Edmunds [R] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] | Del. Hyland Fowler [R] |
Del. Todd Gilbert [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Charles Poindexter [R] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Chris Runion [R] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Del. Wendell Walker [R] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] | Del. Michael Webert [R] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Del. Thomas Wright [R] | Del. Scott Wyatt [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010) | |
2020-10-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 10 (effective 10/21/20) | |
2020-10-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020 | |
2020-10-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020 |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5041ER) |
2020-10-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-10-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-02 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-09-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (35-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-08-28 | House | VOTE: Passage Emergency (94-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-27 | House | Engrossed bill reprinted 20201010D-EH1 |
2020-08-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 20201010D-EH1 |
2020-08-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB5041EH1 |
2020-08-27 | House | Amendments by Delegate Head agreed to |
2020-08-27 | House | Emergency clause added |
2020-08-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20201010D-H1 |
2020-08-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-08-26 | House | Read first time |
2020-08-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 20201010D-H1 |
2020-08-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-08-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200220D |
Same As/Similar To
SB5042 (Same As) 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 138.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1732 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1808 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |