VA HB5028 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for COVID-19. Establishes a presumption that COVID-19 causing the death or disability of firefighters, emergency medical services personnel, law-enforcement officers, first responders, health care providers, and school board employees is an occupational diseases compensable under the Workers' Compensation Act. The provisions of the bill will be effective retroactive to January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateRereferred from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-04HouseVOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N)
2020-09-04HouseRead third time and passed House (61-Y 37-N)
2020-09-03HousePrinted as engrossed 20200397D-E
2020-09-03HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB5028E
2020-09-03HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-09-03HouseRead second time
2020-09-02HouseRead first time
2020-08-31HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 8-N)
2020-08-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-08-26HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (18-Y 4-N)
2020-08-17HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-08-17HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200397D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
652402.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback