VA HB5013 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-10 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (12-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Civil action for deprivation of rights; duties and liabilities of certain employers in employing or contracting for the services of law-enforcement officers. Creates a civil action for the deprivation of a person's rights by a law-enforcement officer and provides that a plaintiff may be awarded compensatory damages, punitive damages, and equitable relief, as well as reasonable attorney fees and costs. The bill provides that sovereign immunity or any other immunities or limitations on liability or damages shall not apply to such actions and that qualified immunity is not a defense to liability for such deprivation of rights. Finally, the bill provides that any public or private entity that employs or contracts for the services of a law-enforcement officer owes a duty of reasonable care to third parties in its hiring, supervision, training, retention, and use of such officers under its employment or contract. Civil action for deprivation of rights; duties and liabilities of certain employers in employing or contracting for the services of law-enforcement officers. Creates a civil action for the deprivation of a person's rights by a law-enforcement officer and provides that a plaintiff may be awarded compensatory damages, punitive damages, and equitable relief, as well as reasonable attorney fees and costs. The bill provides that sovereign immunity or any other immunities or limitations on liability or damages shall not apply to such actions and that qualified immunity is not a defense to liability for such deprivation of rights. Finally, the bill provides that any public or private entity that employs or contracts for the services of a law-enforcement officer owes a duty of reasonable care to third parties in its hiring, supervision, training, retention, and use of such officers under its employment or contract.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil action for deprivation of rights; duties and liabilities of certain employers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (49-Y 45-N 2-A) (Y: 49 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - House - House: VOTE: Reconsider (53-Y 42-N 2-A) (Y: 53 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (47-Y 48-N 3-A) (Y: 47 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-09-03 - House - House: VOTE: Engrossment (47-Y 45-N) (Y: 47 N: 45 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Appropriations (11-Y 11-N) (Y: 11 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-10SenatePassed by indefinitely in Judiciary (12-Y 3-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-08HouseVOTE: Passage (49-Y 45-N 2-A)
2020-09-08HousePassed House (49-Y 45-N 2-A)
2020-09-08HouseVOTE: Reconsider (53-Y 42-N 2-A)
2020-09-08HouseReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House (53-Y 42-N 2-A)
2020-09-04HouseVOTE: Passage (47-Y 48-N 3-A)
2020-09-04HouseRead third time and defeated by House (47-Y 48-N 3-A)
2020-09-03HouseVOTE: Engrossment (47-Y 45-N)
2020-09-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute (47-Y 45-N) HB5013H1
2020-09-03HousePending question ordered
2020-09-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20201095D-H1
2020-09-03HouseRead second time
2020-09-02HouseRead first time
2020-09-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201095D-H1
2020-09-01HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
2020-09-01HouseReconsidered by Appropriations
2020-08-31HouseFailed to report (defeated) in Appropriations (11-Y 11-N)
2020-08-28HouseRead first time
2020-08-28HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-08-28HouseMotion to refer to committee agreed to
2020-08-26HouseReported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N)
2020-08-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-08-14HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200380D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80142.6(n/a)See Bill Text
80142.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5013&202+sum+HB5013
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5013+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5013H1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H08V0018+HB5013
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0002+HB5013
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0015+HB5013
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0043+HB5013
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0052+HB5013
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0066+HB5013
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0067+HB5013
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0058+HB5013

Bill Comments

feedback