VA HB5003 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Committee Referral Pending
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Refunds for penalties for late payments of the litter tax. Directs the Department of Taxation to waive penalties for late payment of the litter tax for the taxable year beginning June 1, 2019, and ending May 31, 2020. The Department would refund any penalties already paid, provided that the tax is paid in full by December 31, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Litter tax; refunds for penalties for late payments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30HouseCommittee Referral Pending
2020-07-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200138D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback