VA HB5001 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0434)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Shipping and Logistics Headquarters Grant Program. Establishes the Shipping and Logistics Headquarters Grant Program to provide grants to a qualified shipping and logistics company that retains its North American headquarters in the City of Norfolk, makes a capital investment of at least $36 million, creates and maintains at least 415 new jobs, and establishes and operates a research and development center. The qualified company would be eligible for an aggregate of $9.5 million in grants, payable in installments and contingent upon the qualified company's meeting performance parameters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shipping and Logistics Headquarters Grant Program; established, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0434)
2021-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 434 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5001ER)
2021-03-09HouseEnrolled
2021-02-27SenatePassed Senate (36-Y 2-N 1-A)
2021-02-27SenateRead third time
2021-02-25SenateRead second time
2021-02-25SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-19HouseVOTE: Passage (87-Y 12-N)
2021-02-19HouseRead third time and passed House (87-Y 12-N)
2021-02-18HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-17HouseRead first time
2021-02-15HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-11HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-02-11HousePresented and ordered printed 21200008D
2021-02-11HouseIntroduced at the request of Governor

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591284.38(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback