VA HB497 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Students who receive home instruction; dual enrollment courses. Requires each school board to permit any student who receives home instruction and resides in the local school division to apply for enrollment as a part-time student of the local school division in any dual enrollment course offered pursuant to an agreement for postsecondary degree attainment at a public high school in the local school division or at the comprehensive community college. The bill specifies that no such student shall be required to pay more in tuition or fees than the tuition or fees paid by public school students or the school division of residence on behalf of such students to enroll in such course.
Title
Students who receive home instruction; dual enrollment courses in local school division.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Education |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102555D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |