VA HB494 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
City reversion to town status. Increases the required vote of a city council initiating a city reversion process from a majority to a three-fourths vote of the all members.
Title
City reversion to town status; increases required vote of a city council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101236D |