VA HB490 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Farm vehicles; use. Prohibits the nonfarm use of vehicles registered as a farm motor vehicle. Current law permits the use of such vehicles (i) by the owner or his immediate family for attending church or school, securing medical treatment or supplies, and securing other household or family necessities and (ii) by volunteer emergency medical services personnel and volunteer firefighters for responding to calls, reporting for duty, or attending meetings or drills.
Title
Farm vehicles; use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Transportation |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100898D |