VA HB488 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Blacksburg. Makes clarifying changes to language that provides that the town shall vote on a proposed ordinance two times and that an ordinance may only be passed at the same meeting at which the public hearing is held unless the agenda for such meeting indicates that the ordinance will not be acted on at the meeting.
Title
Blacksburg, Town of; amending charter, clarifies voting on proposed ordinance.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Hurst [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 317 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB488ER) |
2018-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18104342D-E |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB488E |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104342D |