VA HB486 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; granting of certain mixed beverage licenses. Provides that, notwithstanding the requirement for a referendum for liquor by the drink, the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board may issue a mixed beverage license to establishments located on property along State Route 685 approximately 1,600 feet east of the intersection of State Routes 652 and 685.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; granting of certain mixed beverage licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 8-N) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494)
2018-03-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 494 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President
2018-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-10HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB486ER)
2018-03-10HouseEnrolled
2018-03-08SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2018-03-08SenatePassed by temporarily
2018-03-08HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 8-N)
2018-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (87-Y 8-N)
2018-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-02-28SenateSenators: DeSteph, Cosgrove, Spruill
2018-02-28SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-02-27HouseDelegates: Hurst, Peace, Leftwich
2018-02-27HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-02-27HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-02-26SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-02-26SenateSenate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N)
2018-02-22HouseSenate amendments rejected by House (1-Y 98-N)
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-02-20SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-20SenateReading of amendments waived
2018-02-20SenateRead third time
2018-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2018-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-01-31HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
2018-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House (92-Y 6-N)
2018-01-30HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-29HouseRead first time
2018-01-25HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104199D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41126(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB486
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB486+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB486ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0494+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1103V0004+HB0486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0014+HB0486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0177+HB0486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S09V0082+HB0486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0560HB0486+HB0486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0571HB0486+HB0486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0581HB0486+HB0486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0582HB0486+HB0486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0981+HB0486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0681HB0486+HB0486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1481+HB0486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1058HB0486+HB0486

Bill Comments

feedback