VA HB481 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hospitals; price transparency. Requires every hospital to make information about standard charges for items and services provided by the hospital available on the hospital's website by July 1, 2023. The bill directs the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to develop recommendations for implementation of the bill and to report those recommendations to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by November 1, 2022. Hospitals; price transparency. Requires every hospital to make information about standard charges for items and services provided by the hospital available on the hospital's website by July 1, 2023. The bill directs the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to develop recommendations for implementation of the bill and to report those recommendations to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by November 1, 2022.
Title
Hospitals; price transparency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 297 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB481ER) |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22107208D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB481S1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107208D-S1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107208D-S1 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB481H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106360D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106360D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101862D |