VA HB480 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Restitution; enforcement. Provides that the enforcement of an order of restitution docketed as a civil judgment is not subject to any statute of limitations.
Title
Restitution; enforcement.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100017D |