VA HB48 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB734-Watts) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Income tax; rolling conformity with the federal Internal Revenue Code. Provides that Virginia conform with federal tax laws on a rolling basis, which means that Virginia tax laws incorporate changes to the Internal Revenue Code as soon as Congress enacts them. Under current law, Virginia conforms to federal tax laws as of December 31, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax, state; rolling conformity with the federal Internal Revenue Code.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends incorporating (HB734-Watts) by voice vote
2020-01-23HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-11-25HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-11-25HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100499D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581301(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback