VA HB48 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Charitable solicitations; registration statement. Requires charitable organizations to include in their annual registration statement (i) a statement indicating the amount of funds expended during the preceding fiscal year to pay for the administrative expenses of the charitable organization, expressed as a dollar amount and as a percentage of the total expenses of the charitable organization, and (ii) a statement indicating the amount of funds expended during the preceding fiscal year that was dedicated to providing charitable services, expressed as a dollar amount and as a percentage of the total expenses of the charitable organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charitable solicitations; registration statement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268)
2018-03-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 268 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
2018-02-28SenateSigned by President
2018-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB48ER)
2018-02-26HouseEnrolled
2018-02-22SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22SenateRead third time
2018-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-02HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HousePassed by for the day
2018-01-31HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB48H1
2018-01-31HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105074D-H1
2018-01-31HouseRead second time
2018-01-30HousePassed by for the day
2018-01-29HouseRead first time
2018-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105074D-H1
2018-01-25HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2017-11-30HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-11-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101319D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB48
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB48+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB48H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB48ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0268+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1103V0001+HB0048
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0011+HB0048
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0284+HB0048
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S12V0157+HB0048
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0596HB0048+HB0048
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0620HB0048+HB0048

Bill Comments

feedback