VA HB470 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; advertising "Happy Hour." Requires the ABC Board to adopt regulations to allow a retail on-premises licensee to post on a website or social media site maintained or administered by the licensee or his agent information about the time periods during which alcoholic beverages are being sold at reduced prices and to include in connection therewith the terms "Happy Hour" or "Drink Specials," provided (i) such information is not sent or otherwise disseminated electronically by the licensee and (ii) the licensee complies with all other provisions of ABC law and ABC Board regulations.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; retail licensee advertising Happy Hour on its website.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] | Del. David Englin [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-10 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB470H1 | |
2012-02-09 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104856D-H1 | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-07 | House: Incorporates HB1026 | |
2012-02-07 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104856D-H1 | |
2012-02-07 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101415D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1026 (Similar To) 2012-02-07 - House: Incorporated by General Laws