VA HB466 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0242)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0242)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Business license waivers. Allows localities with a population greater than 50,000 to waive license requirements for businesses with gross receipts of $200,000 or less. Current law limits such waiver to businesses with gross receipts of less than $100,000.
Title
Business licenses; certain localities allowed to waive requirements.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0242) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 242 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB466ER) |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-15 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102555D |