VA HB465 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local regulation of certain transportation companies. Extends from January 1, 2020, to October 1, 2020, the prohibition on offering motorized skateboards or scooters, bicycles, or electric power-assisted bicycles for hire in any locality that has not enacted any licensing ordinance, regulation, or other action regulating such business. The bill clarifies that localities are authorized to create or amend such ordinances, regulations, or actions even after any such business is operating in the locality and exercise authority otherwise authorized by law. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Transportation companies, certain; local regulation.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478) | |
2020-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 478 (effective 3/27/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB465ER) |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-29 | House | VOTE: Passage Emergency (93-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-03 | House | Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 20103293D |