VA HB463 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Polling places; prohibited activities or conduct; application to locations for absentee voting in person. Clarifies that the provisions of law prohibiting certain activities or conduct in and around a polling place also apply to offices of the general registrar, voter satellite offices, and drop-off locations during the period that absentee voting in person is available.
Title
Polling places; prohibited activities or conduct, application to locations for absentee voting.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Runion [R] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Election Administration |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103325D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1023 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 701.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 707.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |