VA HB459 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Possession or transportation of firearms following convictions for certain misdemeanor crimes; restoration of rights; penalty. Prohibits a person who has been convicted of assault and battery when the person intentionally selects the person against whom a simple assault is committed because of his race, religious conviction, color, or national origin from possessing or transporting a firearm. A person who violates this provision is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill provides for a process by which a person convicted of such crimes may petition the circuit court for a reinstatement of his right to possess or transport a firearm.
Title
Firearms; possession or transportation following certain crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1288-Murphy) by voice vote |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101863D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1288 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (12-Y 3-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.1:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB459 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB459+hil |