VA HB452 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0044)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0044)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; small purchases. Increases from $100,000 to $200,000 the small purchases exemption under the Virginia Public Procurement Act for single or term contracts for goods and services other than professional services. The bill also removes outdated provisions related to informal solicitations required to be posted on the Department of General Services' central electronic procurement website.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; small purchases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0044) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 44 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB452ER) |
2020-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB452H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106867D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106867D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103225D |
Same As/Similar To
SB650 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104)