VA HB451 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commission on Economic Opportunity for Virginians in Aspiring and Diverse Communities; report. Establishes a 13-member legislative Commission on Economic Opportunity for Virginians in Aspiring and Diverse Communities (the Commission) to determine the need for and ways to achieve economic opportunities for members of aspiring and diverse communities in Virginia. The bill provides that the Commission sunsets on July 1, 2019.
Title
Economic Opportunity for Virginians in Aspiring & Diverse Communities, Commission on; report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 650 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/16/16 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB451ER) |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-09 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N) |
2016-03-09 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 3-N) |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Printed as engrossed 16101579D-E |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB451E |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2016-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101579D |