VA HB449 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; permitted up to and including election day. Repeals the deadline for registering to vote in advance of an election and allows eligible voters to register at any time, including the day of the election. A person who is eligible to vote, but is not registered, may register and be permitted to vote on election day by appearing in person at the polling place for the precinct of which he is a resident and (i) providing certain identifying information; (ii) signing a statement, subject to felony penalties, that he is a qualified voter of that precinct but for not being registered to vote; and (iii) providing proof of residency. Residency may be proven by presenting (a) his valid Virginia driver's license or other photo identification issued by the Commonwealth, one of its political subdivisions, or the United States that contains a valid address in the precinct or (b) any document that contains a valid address in the precinct together with one of the forms of identification accepted for purposes of voting. The bill requires the State Board to provide instructions for the prompt addition of the voter to the Virginia voter registration system on the day of the election.
Title
Voter registration; permitted up to and including election day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102776D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 3604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 3831 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 1002.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 419 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 420.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 422 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 424 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 427 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 432 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 653 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |