VA HB441 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; voting systems; reporting absentee results by precinct. Includes in the definition of "voting system" on-demand ballot printing systems and ballot marking devices used to manufacture or mark ballots to be cast by voters on electronic voting and counting machines. The bill also requires general registrars to report to the Department of Election the number and results of absentee ballots cast by voters assigned to each precinct in the registrar's locality. The Department will establish standards for ascertaining and reporting such information.
Title
Voting systems; reporting absentee results by precinct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102652D |