VA HB440 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Railroads; crew size; civil penalty. Requires a train or light engine used in connection with the movement of railroad freight in the Commonwealth to operate with a crew of at least two individuals, unless such movement involves hostler service or utility employees in yard service. The State Corporation Commission shall have discretion to fine a person willfully violating this requirement an amount not to exceed $500 for a first offense and an amount not to exceed $1,000 for a second or subsequent offense. The measure has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Railroads; freight train crew size requirements, civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N 1-A) (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateStricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-22HouseVOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N 1-A)
2020-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House (61-Y 37-N 1-A)
2020-01-21HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-20HouseRead first time
2020-01-16HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 8-N)
2020-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102226D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback