VA HB439 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relocation of call centers to a foreign country; notification requirements. Requires certain call centers that intend to relocate operations from the Commonwealth to a foreign country to give the Commissioner of Labor and Industry at least 120 days' prior notice. The measure requires the Commissioner to compile a semiannual list of all employers that relocate a call center from the Commonwealth to a foreign country and to distribute the list to state agencies. Subject to exceptions, an employer that appears on the list is (i) ineligible for five years for any direct or indirect grants of state funds, any loans from or guaranteed by the state, or any tax credit or reduction in tax liability and (ii) required to repay any financial incentives the employer has previously received. The measure requires new state agency contracts for the performance of state business-related call center and customer service work to provide that such work will be performed entirely within the Commonwealth.
Title
Relocation of call centers to a foreign country; notification requirements.
Sponsors
Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-01-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106620D-H1 |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102230D |