VA HB437 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of General Services; disposition of surplus materials; permit sale to active military-owned and military spouse-owned businesses. Requires the Department of General Services to permit surplus materials to be sold, prior to public sale or auction, to active military-owned and military spouse-owned businesses.
Title
DGS; disposition of surplus materials, permit sale to military spouse-owned businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358) | |
2020-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 358 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB437ER) |
2020-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (85-Y 14-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 14-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB437H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20105951D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 20105951D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101385D |