VA HB431 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Qualified health plans; state-mandated health benefits. Authorizes a qualified health plan offered on the Virginia Health Benefit Exchange to provide state-mandated health benefits that are not provided in the essential health benefits package. Under current law, qualified health plans are prohibited from providing such state-mandated health benefits.
Title
Qualified health plans; state-mandated health benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 560 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB431ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption #2 (94-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by House |
2022-03-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference substitute printed 22107826D-H1 |
2022-03-12 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Boysko, Ebbin, Ruff |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Delegates: Murphy, Byron, Fariss |
2022-03-09 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-09 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 95-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 95-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22102882D-E |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB431E |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102882D |
Same As/Similar To
SB449 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
SB449 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
SB449 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)