VA HB43 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Reporting lost or stolen firearms; civil penalty. Requires a person who lawfully possesses a firearm to report the loss or theft of the firearm to any local law-enforcement agency or the Department of State Police within 24 hours after such person discovers the loss or theft or is informed by a person with personal knowledge of the loss or theft. The bill requires the relevant law-enforcement agency to enter the report information into the National Crime Information Center (NCIC). A violation is punishable by a civil penalty of $50 for a first offense and not less than $100 or more than $250 for any subsequent offense. The bill provides that a person who, in good faith, reports the loss or theft is immune from criminal or civil liability for acts or omissions that result from the loss or theft; the immunity does not apply to a person who knowingly gives a false report. The bill does not apply to the loss or theft of an antique firearm.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; reporting when lost or stolen.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2018-01-17HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-11-30HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-11-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101053D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182287.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback