VA HB428 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Stricken from docket by Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Stricken from docket by Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum speed limits. Establishes a minimum speed of 45 miles per hour on interstate highways or other limited access highways with divided roadways, nonlimited access highways having four or more lanes, and all primary highways.
Title
Speed limits; minimum speed on certain highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Stricken from docket by Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Stricken from docket by Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100384D |