VA HB421 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0649)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0649)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Living organ donors; discrimination prohibited. Prohibits any person from refusing to insure, refusing to continue to insure, or limiting the amount or extent of life insurance, disability insurance, or long-term care insurance coverage available to an individual or to charge an individual a different rate for the same coverage based solely and without any additional actuarial risks upon the status of such individual as a living organ donor. The provisions of the bill apply to such insurance plans that are entered into, amended, extended, or renewed on or after January 1, 2023.
Title
Insurance; discrimination based on status as living organ donor prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0649) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 649 (effective 1/1/23) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB421ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-09 | House | Delegates: Delaney, Byron, O'Quinn |
2022-03-09 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senators: Ebbin, Mason, Lewis |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-28 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22106801D-S1 (0-Y 98-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB421S1 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106801D-S1 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106801D-S1 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101025D |
Same As/Similar To
SB271 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
SB271 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
SB271 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto