VA HB421 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax exemptions; military members and their surviving spouses. Extends the property tax exemptions for the principal residences of certain disabled veterans and surviving spouses of members of the armed forces killed in action to include real property improvements made to the land surrounding such residences so long as the principal use of the improvement is (i) to house or cover motor vehicles or household goods and personal effects and (ii) for other than a business purpose. Article X, Section 6-A of the Constitution of Virginia exempts from local real property taxes the principal residences of (i) veterans with a 100 percent service-connected, permanent, and total disability and (ii) surviving spouses of members of the armed forces killed in action. Under the Code of Virginia, in general, up to one acre upon which the principal residence is situated is also exempt from local property taxes. The bill extends the exemption to other improvements made to such one acre so long as the principal use of the improvement is (i) to house or cover motor vehicles or household goods and personal effects and (ii) for other than a business purpose. The provisions of the bill are effective for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2017.
Title
Real property tax; exemptions for military members and their surviving spouses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 485 (effective 1/1/17) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB421ER) |
2016-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB421H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104779D-H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104779D-H1 |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101333D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3219.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3219.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |