VA HB420 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Emergency Management; review of emergency services and disaster preparedness plans. Directs the Department of Emergency Management (the Department) to review its emergency services and disaster preparedness programs to determine if changes are necessary to address the needs of individuals with limited English proficiency, as defined in the bill, and individuals with access or functional needs. The bill directs the Department to complete its review no later than November 1, 2020, and report its findings to the Chairs of the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology and the House Committee on General Laws. Such report shall include any recommendations for legislation that would be required to fully address the needs of individuals with limited English proficiency and individuals with access or functional needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency services and disaster preparedness plans; DEM to review plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590)
2020-04-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 590 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB420ER)
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20108688D-S1 (100-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-28SenatePassed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenatePassed Senate with substitute (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenatePassed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB420S1
2020-02-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108688D-S1
2020-02-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-28SenateRead third time
2020-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108688D-S1
2020-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06HousePrinted as engrossed 20100642D-E
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB420E
2020-02-06HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-03HouseReported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
2020-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-24HouseReported from Public Safety with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned PS sub: Public Safety
2020-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100642D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB420
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB420+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB420E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB420S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB420ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0590+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1502V0005+HB0420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H15V0012+HB0420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0207V0013+HB0420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0096+HB0420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0605+HB0420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0182+HB0420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0458+HB0420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1203HB0420+HB0420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1261HB0420+HB0420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1295HB0420+HB0420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1296HB0420+HB0420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1297HB0420+HB0420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1298HB0420+HB0420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1689+HB0420

Bill Comments 750

feedback