VA HB42 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Health care providers; screening of patients for prenatal and postpartum depression; training. Directs the Board of Medicine to annually issue a communication to every practitioner licensed by the Board who provides primary, maternity, obstetrical, or gynecological health care services reiterating the standard of care pertaining to prenatal or postnatal depression or other depression and encouraging practitioners to screen every patient who is pregnant or who has been pregnant within the previous five years for prenatal or postnatal depression or other depression, as clinically appropriate. The bill requires the Board to include in such communication information about the factors that may increase susceptibility of certain patients to prenatal or postnatal depression or other depression, including racial and economic disparities, and to encourage providers to remain cognizant of the increased risk of depression for such patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prenatal and postnatal depression, etc.; importance of screening patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (10-Y 5-N)
2020-02-12SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB42H1
2020-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107179D-H1
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-04HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107179D-H1
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health Professions
2019-11-19HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-11-19HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100344D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412928.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5413005(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback