VA HB417 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Modification of sentencing guidelines; new sentencing proceeding. Creates a mechanism for a person incarcerated for a felony offense to petition for a new sentencing hearing if the sentencing guidelines for the offense have been modified subsequent to the date of the person's conviction and the sentence indicated by the current guidelines is less than the sentence indicated by the guidelines in effect at the time of the conviction. The bill provides that the petition is to be filed with the circuit court that entered the judgment order of conviction, which shall conduct a new sentencing proceeding. Any sentence imposed as a result of this proceeding may not exceed the sentence originally imposed.
Title
Sentencing guidelines; modification, new sentencing proceeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103651D |