VA HB416 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rural gravel road network in Loudoun County. Provides specific goals for VDOT's maintenance of the rural gravel road network in Loudoun County.
Title
Loudoun County; VDOT's duties & responsibilities to properly maintain the rural gravel road network.
Sponsors
Del. William Howell [R] | Del. Thomas Greason [R] | Del. Randall Minchew [R] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276) | |
2014-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 276 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB416ER) |
2014-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 14104966D-S1 (97-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB416S1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104966D-S1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104966D-S1 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB416H1 |
2014-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104318D-H1 |
2014-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104318D-H1 |
2014-01-23 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102076D |
Same As/Similar To
SB397 (Same As) 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704)