VA HB413 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Subdivision ordinance; energy efficiency and renewable energy provisions. Authorizes a local governing body to include in its subdivision ordinance provisions for establishing minimum standards of energy efficiency and establishing and maintaining access to sources of renewable energy.
Title
Subdivision ordinance; energy efficiency and renewable energy provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100687D |