VA HB410 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-19 - Incorporated by Counties, Cities and Towns
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-19 - Incorporated by Counties, Cities and Towns
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Virginia Beach. Amends the charter for the City of Virginia Beach to reflect the City's transition to a city council consisting solely of single-member districts and the mayor.
Title
Virginia Beach, City of; amending charter, transition of city council.
Sponsors
Del. Alex Askew [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-19 | House | Incorporated by Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB416-Convirs-Fowler) by voice vote |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104528D |
Same As/Similar To
HB416 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
SB189 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
SB189 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB410 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB410+hil |