VA HB400 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Student Loan Refinancing Authority established. Establishes the Virginia Student Loan Refinancing Authority, to be governed by a 10-member board, for the purpose of developing and implementing a program by which each individual who incurred qualified education loan debt as a Virginia student at an institution of higher education in the Commonwealth and who is eligible, on the basis of criteria established by the Authority that are substantially similar to criteria used by private lenders in the Commonwealth to evaluate student eligibility for an unsecured personal loan at market rates, may receive a loan from the Authority to refinance all or part of his qualified education loans, as that term is defined in relevant federal law.
Title
Virginia Student Loan Refinancing Authority established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | House | Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100304D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB400 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB400+hil |