VA HB4 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School principals; incident reports. Requires that school principals report to law enforcement certain enumerated acts that may constitute a misdemeanor offense and report to the parents of any minor student who is the specific object of such act that the incident has been reported to law enforcement. Under current law, principals are required to make such reports only for such acts that may constitute a felony offense. The bill provides, as an exception to the requirement to report any written threats against school personnel while on a school bus, on school property, or at a school-sponsored activity, that a principal is not required but may report to the local law-enforcement agency any such incident committed by a student who has a disability.
Title
School principals; incident reports, written threats against school personnel, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (88-Y 12-N) (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 43-N) (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 40-N) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (47-Y 51-N) (Y: 47 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 43-N) (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 40-N) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (47-Y 51-N) (Y: 47 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793) | |
2022-05-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 793 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Communicated to Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB4ER2) |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 passed by for the day |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (88-Y 12-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (88-Y 12-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 43-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation #1 (57-Y 43-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB4ER) |
2022-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-23 | House | VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 34-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (65-Y 34-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (27-Y 13-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (10-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (59-Y 40-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (59-Y 40-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB4H1 |
2022-01-31 | House | VOTE: Rejected (47-Y 51-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Amendment by Delegate Rasoul rejected (47-Y 51-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105170D-H1 |
2022-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2022-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105170D-H1 |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (17-Y 5-N) |
2021-12-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-12-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102790D |
Same As/Similar To
SB36 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
SB36 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
SB36 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)